+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Nutt moved that the House reconsider SB 1068 within the next 14 days. Motion passed by v/v.
- Third read in House: FAILED
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:37PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Livingston flr amend (ref TPS) adopted
- TPS (ref Bill) adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 30, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 43
February 26, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 16, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor