+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 268
- Action: Signed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: County and Municipal Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2015: County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2015: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor