+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Dial flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
Dial flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 15, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor