+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Roberts - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to ROBERTS Floor Amend - Blackman - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Representative Roberts to include the Roberts flr amendment and exclude the Blackman flr amendment
- Third read in House: PASSED
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: withdrawn.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 28, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 8
February 24, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
February 24, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 1, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 11, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor