+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 137
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
February 26, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 26, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 15, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor