+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 16 13 1 0 passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator murphy motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb 1063 on third reading on march 12, 2014. motion carried.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pmobject
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 17, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2014: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
January 15, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor