+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:41PM.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2017: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 12, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor