+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cook - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 16, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 15, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 24, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 24, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
January 11, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor