+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- EENR - passed
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass amended.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
March 17, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 10, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
March 10, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 17, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2016: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 17, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2016: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 8, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 8, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 11, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 11, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor