+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:04PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 11, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor