+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- House first read
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:18 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 14, 2015: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor