+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Boyer - passed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:41PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 16, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 20, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 6, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 11, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor