+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Kavanagh flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (6)
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Kavanagh flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
February 22, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2016: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 11, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor