+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 23
- Action: Signed
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 7, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:00 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-7 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
March 11, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 11, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
January 14, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor