+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Gowan flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2023: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 16, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
January 19, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2023: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor