+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
- House second read
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
1-14 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
February 20, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 13, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor