+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 61 e
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to WM - Harper
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- House second read
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Murphy flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Aboud flr amend (ref Bill)
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pmobject
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Harper floor amendment; reference to the Ways and Means Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Harper floor amendment; reference to the Ways and Means Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-10 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
1-20fin_as passed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
March 20, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 3
February 2, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 9, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2