+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 4
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to WM - Chabin
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to WM - Gallego #1
- Amendment withdrawn: Floor Amend to WM - Gallego #2
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to WM - Carter
- Third read: Passed
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- House second read
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Murphy flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Aboud flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Sen Aboud to include the Aboud flr. amend
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pmobject
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Carter floor amendment; reference to the Ways and Means Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Carter floor amendment; reference to the Ways and Means Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-22 fin housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
1-20fin_as passed
Senate Fact Sheet
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
February 2, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 9, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2