+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 96
- Action: Signed
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:26 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
4-25 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
4-4 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
1-8 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
February 14, 2007: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 22, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 8, 2007: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor