+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 293
- Action: Signed
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to Senate
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: MAPS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:45 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
4-14 pshs_hosuechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
1-24 pshs-bsfss_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
1-14 pshs-bsfss
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (8)
April 14, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2011: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
January 10, 2011: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
January 10, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor