+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Health Committee: held.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 8, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor