+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:15PM.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 24, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 24, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 11, 2021: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor