+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- House adopted conference committee report.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommendation: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
- Senate Minority report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: BOYER, ALSTON, CARTER
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: ALLEN S, MIRANDA, SMITH
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- ED
- SUB Floor Amend to ED to Bill - Carter - passed as amended
- Flr Amend to Carter SUB Amend to ED to Bill - Carter #2 - passed
- Flr Amend to Carter SUB Amend to ED to Bill - Carter #3 - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (7)
April 26, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 22
April 25, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
April 17, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 22
February 20, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 6, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 10, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor