+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 267
- Action: Signed
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- MISCELLANEOUS MOTION: Representative Montenegro motion to suspend rules 8k, 33c and 33d. Motion passed by v/v
- Transmit to Senate
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Representative larkin moved that the House reconsider sb1041 immediately. motion passed by v/v
- Motion
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Vote detail 35 21 4 0 passed
- Third read: Failed
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rural and Economic Development: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Rural and Economic Development
- House first read
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: NR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Natural Resources - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2015: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 4
March 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2015: Rural and Economic Development: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2015: Natural Resources: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor