+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 19, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 1
January 9, 2012: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6