+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: withdrawn.
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
January 10, 2022: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor