+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 285
- Action: Signed
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: MAPS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-20 pshs_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
5-10 pshs_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-9 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
April 10, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
February 29, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 29, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 9, 2012: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6