+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 10, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3