+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- JUD - passed
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (6)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 4, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
May 4, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 30, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
March 30, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
March 1, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
March 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 24, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2016: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 11, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor