+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Friese to include Friese Floor Amend to Bill
- Floor Amend to Bill - Friese - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
May 4, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
March 8, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 8, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 10, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 10, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7