+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:53PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
February 19, 2018: House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 30, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 8, 2018: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor