+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:34PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:11PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 25, 2020: House Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 30, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 13, 2020: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor