+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) withdrawn
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
March 2, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 28, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 10, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 10, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7