+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 10:11AM.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
January 17, 2023: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor