+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 131
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CWD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Smith flr amend (ref CWD)
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass amended
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor