+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 185
- Action: Signed
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- House first read
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Pearce R flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Withdrawn
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Pearce R flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pearce R flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-15 approp_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-3 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
March 30, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 30, 2010: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 25, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2010: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor