+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Criminal Justice Reform Committee: do pass.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Criminal Justice Reform Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Barto flr amend (ref JUD) adopted
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2021: House Criminal Justice Reform Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 23, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 11, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor