+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House adopted conference committee report.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommendation: That the bill be accepted as originally passed by the Senate.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: CARTER, POWERS HANNLEY, UDALL
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: BARTO, HOBBS, LESKO
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:19PM.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:04PM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 26, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 7
March 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 10
February 27, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 2, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 9, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor