+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 21, 2008 in the House:
- Rep. anderson moved that the House reconsider sb 1025 immediately. motion passed by v/v.
- Motion
- Vote detail 31 29 0 0 y passed
- Third read: Failed
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Anderson
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:00 amobject
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- House first read
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: EDK12 (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Gray L flr amend (ref Bill)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass amended
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Gray L Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Anderson Floor Amendment Refrence to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Anderson Floor Amendment Refrence to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gray L Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
5-15 as vetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
1-17 CAUCUS-FLOOR
Senate Fact Sheet
1-14K12
Senate Fact Sheet
2-12 aspassedsenate
Senate Fact Sheet
4-21_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 7, 2008: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2008: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 3
April 21, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
March 3, 2008: Education (K-12): Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 11, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
January 14, 2008: Education K-12: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor