+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Representative Petersen moved that the House reconsider SB 1024 within the next 14 days. Motion passed by v/v.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- WM - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Friese - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass amended.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Borrelli motion to reconsider whereby the Senate passed SB 1024 on Third Reading on February 5, 2019. Motion carried.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Borrelli flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2019: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 30
April 17, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 26, 2019: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 14, 2019: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor