+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
On April 7, 2008 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: McCune Davis flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref GOV)
- COW motion
- Senator mccune davis to include the mccune davis floor amendment
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (14)
McCune Davis Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2008: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
January 14, 2008: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor