+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:36PM.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 28, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
March 3, 2021: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 11, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor