+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
- House second read
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRIPD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref NRIPD)
- Amendment adopted: L. Gray flr amend (ref NRIPD)
- Amendment adopted: Gorman flr amend (ref NRIPD)
- Amendment adopted: Gorman flr amend (ref Bill)
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass amended
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Adopted Amendment
L Gray Floor Amendment; reference to NRIPD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gorman Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gorman Floor Amendment; reference to NRIPD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Adopted Amendment
L Gray Floor Amendment; reference to NRIPD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gorman Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-17 caucus floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Gorman Floor Amendment; reference to NRIPD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Proposed Amendment
1017nripd_as vetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 9
June 23, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
June 23, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2009: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor