+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 109
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
- House second read
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1016PSHS
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 10
June 16, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
June 16, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor