+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pmobject
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: Amended by FIN (ref Bill)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Finance
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2011: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 8, 2011: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor