+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- SUB Floor Amend to Rivero to LIA - Clark - failed
- LIA - passed
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 1:44PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Local and International Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Local and International Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:45PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 50
February 19, 2018: House Local and International Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 29, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
January 8, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor