+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:38 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Veterans and Military Affairs
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
1-12 REVISED VMA
Senate Fact Sheet
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
1-08 VMA
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2010: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 11, 2010: Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor