+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref APPROP)
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 8, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor