+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 122 e
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Technology and Infrastructure: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
- House second read
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (15)
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2-15 pshs_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-7 pshs_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-24 pshs_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
4-13 nrt_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
4-28 nrt_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
March 21, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 15, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2011: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor