+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Vote
January 9, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor